HI SB2658 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-01-25 - (S) Referred to HTH/JDL, WAM.
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-01-25 - (S) Referred to HTH/JDL, WAM.
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Transfers the Office of Language Access to the Department of Health, as an administratively attached agency. Effective July 1, 2012.
Title
Office of Language Access
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-25 | (S) Referred to HTH/JDL, WAM. | |
2012-01-25 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2012-01-25 | (S) Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2374 (Same As) 2012-07-06 - (S) Act 201, 7/3/2012 (Gov. Msg. No. 1304).
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=2658 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2012/Bills/SB2658_.HTM |