HI SB2654 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-08 - (H) Referred to EDN, FIN, referral sheet 41
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-08 - (H) Referred to EDN, FIN, referral sheet 41
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that appropriations to the EDN 100 school-based budgeting program identifier shall not be transferred to any other program identifier of DOE; provides exceptions under certain circumstances. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD2)
Title
Department of Education; Appropriation Limitation; Transfer Funds
Sponsors
Sen. David Ige [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-08 | (H) Referred to EDN, FIN, referral sheet 41 | |
2012-03-08 | (H) Pass First Reading | |
2012-03-06 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 255) in amended form (SD 2). | |
2012-03-06 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. | |
2012-03-02 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 03-06-12. | |
2012-03-02 | (S) Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2638) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). | |
2012-02-28 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 14 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Espero, Fukunaga, Kahele, Kim, Kouchi, Ryan, Tokuda, Wakai, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. | |
2012-02-22 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-28-12 9:00AM in conference room 211. | |
2012-02-17 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. | |
2012-02-17 | (S) Reported from EDU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2331) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. | |
2012-02-15 | (S) The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDU were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Nishihara, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Taniguchi. | |
2012-02-10 | (S) The committee(s) on EDU deferred the measure until 02-15-12 1:15PM in conference room 225. | |
2012-02-03 | (S) The committee(s) on EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 02-10-12 1:15PM in conference room 225. | |
2012-01-25 | (S) Referred to EDU, WAM. | |
2012-01-25 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2012-01-25 | (S) Introduced. |