HI SB2649 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Wednesday 03-18-20 11:15AM in conference room 423.
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Wednesday 03-18-20 11:15AM in conference room 423.
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends section 261-12 to require tour aircraft operations permit applicants to have aircraft that are outfitted with FAA approved safety devices. Prohibits tour aircraft permit holders from allowing the noise footprint of their aircraft to enter any occupied property. Requires denial of permit or rescission of permit if requirements are not met. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Tour Aircraft.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Passed, Unamended (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Passed, Unamended (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-16 | House | This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Wednesday 03-18-20 11:15AM in conference room 423. |
2020-03-16 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 03-18-20 11:15AM in conference room 423. |
2020-03-13 | House | The committee(s) on TRN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-18-20. |
2020-03-11 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by TRN on Friday, 03-13-20 10:15AM in House conference room 423. |
2020-03-09 | House | Referred to TRN, JUD, referral sheet 36 |
2020-03-05 | House | Pass First Reading |
2020-03-03 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 317) in amended form (SD 1). |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2020-02-27 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-03-20. |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2917) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2020-02-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, S. Chang, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara, Ruderman, L. Thielen. |
2020-02-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH will hold a public decision making on 02-20-20 10:00AM in conference room 229. |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to CPH. |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Reported from TRS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2345) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to CPH. |
2020-01-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in TRS were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, English, Shimabukuro, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto. |
2020-01-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRS has scheduled a public hearing on 01-29-20 1:00PM in conference room 225. |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Referred to TRS, CPH. |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Introduced. |