HI SB2646 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on July 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-11 - Act 153, 07/09/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1262).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on July 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-11 - Act 153, 07/09/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1262).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires prescribers of certain controlled substances to consult the State's Electronic Prescription Accountability System before issuing a prescription for the controlled substance, under certain circumstances. Provides that a violation by a prescriber shall not be subject to criminal penalty provisions but that a violation may be grounds for professional discipline. Repeals on 6/30/2023. (CD1)
Title
Relating To Prescription Drugs.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-11 | Senate | Act 153, 07/09/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1262). |
2018-07-11 | House | Act 153, on 07/09/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1262). |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 705). |
2018-05-01 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 849). |
2018-05-01 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2018-04-27 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday 05-01-18. |
2018-04-27 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 123-18) as amended in (CD 1). |
2018-04-27 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-01-18. |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 123-18). |
2018-04-23 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, Takumi, Luke; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Nishimoto, Tupola. |
2018-04-23 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, English, Tokuda; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Espero. |
2018-04-20 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-23-18 10:45AM in conference room 229. |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-20-18 9:05AM in conference room 229. |
2018-04-18 | House | Received notice of change in Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 795). |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Senate Conferees Changed: Senator English added as Co-Chair. Senator Dela Cruz discharged as Co-Chair. |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-19-18 9:00AM in conference room 229. |
2018-04-17 | House | Received notice of change in Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 789). |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Senate Conferees Added: Senator Dela Cruz added as Co-Chair. |
2018-04-16 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 786). |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 610). |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Baker Chair; Espero, Tokuda. |
2018-04-16 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Mizuno, Takumi, Nishimoto, Luke Co-Chairs; Tupola. |
2018-04-16 | House | Re-referred to HHS, CPC, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 57 |
2018-04-12 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 784). |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 587). |
2018-04-10 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 3 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Holt excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2018-04-06 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-10-18. |
2018-04-06 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1953-18) as amended in HD 3, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2018-04-04 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Nishimoto, San Buenaventura, Brower, Morikawa, Takayama, McDermott, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) C. Lee. |
2018-04-02 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Wednesday, 04-04-18 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2018-03-23 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on JUD as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) C. Lee, Lowen, McDermott, Souki, Tokioka excused (5). |
2018-03-23 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1454-18) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to JUD. |
2018-03-21 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ichiyama, Aquino, Ito, Say, Tokioka, Yamane, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Johanson, LoPresti, Mizuno. |
2018-03-19 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 03-21-18 2:15PM in House conference room 329. |
2018-03-16 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Fukumoto, Har, Holt, Nakashima, Souki, Tokioka excused (7). |
2018-03-16 | House | Reported from HHS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1207-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2018-03-14 | House | The committees on HHS recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, Kobayashi, Learmont; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Tupola. |
2018-03-12 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HHS on Wednesday, 03-14-18 8:40AM in House conference room 329. |
2018-03-08 | House | Referred to HHS, CPC, JUD, referral sheet 36 |
2018-03-08 | House | Pass First Reading |
2018-03-06 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 246) in amended form (SD 1). |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2018-03-02 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-06-18. |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2648) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2018-02-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Tokuda, S. Chang, Espero, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara, Ruderman. |
2018-02-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-22-18 9:30AM in conference room 229. |
2018-01-29 | Senate | Re-Referred to CPH. |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Referred to PSM, CPH. |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2018-01-19 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2531 (Same As) 2018-02-14 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Souki excused (1).