HI SB2645 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-01 - Act 169, 06/30/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1271).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-01 - Act 169, 06/30/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1271).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the commission on water resource management to establish a program to provide technical assistance to the counties and public water systems to implement standardized water audits of public water systems. Makes an appropriation. (CD1)
Title
Water Audits; Public Water Systems; Large Capacity Water Systems; Designated Water Management Areas; Appropriation ($)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-01 | Senate | Act 169, 06/30/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1271). |
2016-07-01 | House | Act 169, on 06/30/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1271). |
2016-05-09 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2016-05-05 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 685). |
2016-05-04 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 715). |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2016-05-03 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2016-04-29 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday 05-03-16. |
2016-04-29 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 86-16) as amended in (CD 1). |
2016-04-29 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-03-16. |
2016-04-29 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 86-16). |
2016-04-29 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Cullen, Lowen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Pouha. |
2016-04-29 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 2 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, English; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom. |
2016-04-28 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-29-16 1:05PM in conference room 224. |
2016-04-26 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-28-16 1:05PM in conference room 224. |
2016-04-22 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-16 1:05PM in conference room 224. |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-22-16 1:05PM in conference room 224. |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 613). |
2016-04-18 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 653). |
2016-04-18 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Yamane, Cullen Co-Chairs; Lowen, Pouha. |
2016-04-18 | House | Re-referred to WAL, FIN, referral sheet 52 |
2016-04-18 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Gabbard Chair; English Co-Chair; Slom. |
2016-04-14 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 649). |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 557). |
2016-04-12 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Oshiro, Thielen excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2016-04-08 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Hashem, Ing, Kong, Oshiro, Thielen excused (6). |
2016-04-08 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1627-16) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2016-04-07 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cachola, Cullen, DeCoite, Johanson, Jordan, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, Onishi, Tokioka, Yamashita, Pouha, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2016-04-07 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 04-07-16 2:01PM in House conference room 308. |
2016-04-06 | House | Re-referred to FIN, referral sheet 44 |
2016-03-10 | House | Referred to WAL, FIN, referral sheet 26 |
2016-03-10 | House | Pass First Reading |
2016-03-08 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 217) in amended form (SD 2). |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Riviere). Transmitted to House. |
2016-03-04 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-08-16. |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2739) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2016-03-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Dela Cruz, Chun Oakland, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, Riviere, Wakai, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Taniguchi. |
2016-02-26 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-01-16 1:30PM in conference room 211. |
2016-02-05 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2016-02-05 | Senate | Reported from WLA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2033) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2016-02-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on WLA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WLA were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Nishihara, Riviere, Ruderman, Shimabukuro, L. Thielen, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Wakai. |
2016-01-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on WLA has scheduled a public hearing on 02-01-16 2:45PM in conference room 224. |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Referred to WLA, WAM. |
2016-01-25 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2016-01-22 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2041 (Same As) 2016-03-17 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.