HI SB2640 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-24 - Referred to CPH.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-24 - Referred to CPH.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides a specific exemption to the landlord tenant code for sellers who occupy the residential real property after the transfer of the seller's ownership rights.
Title
Relating To The Landlord Tenant Code.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-24 | Senate | Referred to CPH. |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2018-01-19 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1869 (Same As) 2018-07-11 - Act 194, on 07/10/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1303).
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=2640&year=2018 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2018/bills/SB2640_.HTM |