HI SB2635 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-28 - Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-29-22 4:10PM; Conference Room 329.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-28 - Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-29-22 4:10PM; Conference Room 329.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires health insurers, mutual benefit societies, and health maintenance organizations to cover mandated services for mammography at least as favorably as coverage for other radiological examinations. Effective 7/1/2060. (HD1)
Title
Relating To Coverage For Mammography.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-01 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-21 - House - House Consumer Protection & Commerce: Passed, Unamended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-17 - House - House Health, Human Services, & Homelessness: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - Senate - Senate Health: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-21 - House - House Consumer Protection & Commerce: Passed, Unamended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-17 - House - House Health, Human Services, & Homelessness: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - Senate - Senate Health: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-28 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-29-22 4:10PM; Conference Room 329. |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-28-22 4:10PM; Conference Room 329. |
2022-04-26 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-27-22 4:10PM; Conference Room 329. |
2022-04-25 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-26-22 4:00PM; Conference Room 329. |
2022-04-20 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 729). |
2022-04-20 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Yamane, Kitagawa, Tam Co-Chairs; Kapela, Ward. |
2022-04-18 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 873). |
2022-04-18 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Keohokalole Chair; Baker Co-Chair; Fevella. |
2022-04-08 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 742). |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 472). |
2022-04-07 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Costales, D. Kobayashi, Lowen excused (3). Transmitted to Senate. |
2022-04-07 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1803-22), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2022-04-01 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Yamashita, Branco, Eli, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Marten, Nishimoto, Perruso, Sayama, Tam, Todd; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Holt, Wildberger, McDermott. |
2022-03-28 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 04-01-22 3:00PM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference. |
2022-03-24 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ohno excused (1). |
2022-03-24 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1413-22), recommending referral to FIN. |
2022-03-21 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Kitagawa, Aquino, Har, Hashem, Kong, Mizuno, Morikawa, Onishi, Tarnas, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2022-03-18 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Monday, 03-21-22 2:00PM in House conference room 329 Via Videoconference. |
2022-03-18 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Branco, Ilagan, McKelvey, Ohno excused (4). |
2022-03-18 | House | Reported from HHH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1120-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2022-03-17 | House | The committees on HHH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Tam, Gates, Har, Kapela, Nishimoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2022-03-14 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HHH on Thursday, 03-17-22 9:30AM in House conference room 329 Via Videoconference. |
2022-03-10 | House | Referred to HHH, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 24 |
2022-03-10 | House | Pass First Reading |
2022-03-08 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 275) in amended form (SD 2). |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Fevella). Transmitted to House. |
2022-03-03 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-08-22. |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2762) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2022-02-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Chang, DeCoite, Nishihara, Riviere, San Buenaventura, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2022-02-18 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN will hold a public decision making on 02-22-22 10:00AM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference. |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPN. |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Reported from HTH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2491) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to CPN. |
2022-02-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HTH were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keohokalole, Baker, San Buenaventura; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Moriwaki, Fevella. |
2022-02-10 | Senate | The committee(s) on HTH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-14-22 1:15PM; Via Videoconference. |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Referred to HTH, CPN . |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1774 (Same As) 2022-02-18 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Kapela excused (2).