HI SB2634 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-02 - Re-Referred to CPH, JDL/WAM.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-02 - Re-Referred to CPH, JDL/WAM.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a Health Care Task Force to examine the impact of federal rules extending minimum wage and overtime pay protections under the Fair Labor Standards Act to direct care workers who provide essential home care services to persons with disabilities and older adults.
Title
Health Care Task Force; Fair Labor Standards Act; Direct Services Workers
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-02 | Senate | Re-Referred to CPH, JDL/WAM. |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Referred to CPH/JDL, WAM. |
2016-01-25 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2016-01-22 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2700 (Same As) 2016-02-01 - Referred to HLT/LAB, JUD, referral sheet 5
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=2634&year=2016 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2016/bills/SB2634_.HTM |