HI SB2625 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-23 - The committee on CPH deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-23 - The committee on CPH deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires officers and directors of associations of apartment owners to disclose activities that could reasonably be construed as a conflict of interest and cease the activity or withdraw from office. Prohibits attorneys from representing both the board and managing agent of the association. Prohibits board members from purchasing units at foreclosure sales resulting from the association's lien for unpaid assessments. Prohibits associations from contracting with service providers that have a close connection to a board member or officer of the association. Prohibits any person who contracts to provide services to the association or participates in the association's operation from owning more than fifteen per cent of the units in a project or from purchasing property that is subject to a lien by the association. Prohibits any employee of an association or person who contracts to provide goods or services to an association from soliciting, receiving, or accepting any undisclosed fee, compensation, commission, or gratuity from a third party who provides goods or services or solicits to provide goods or services to the association.
Title
Relating To Condominiums.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-23 | Senate | The committee on CPH deferred the measure. |
2018-02-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-23-18 10:00AM in conference room 229. |
2018-01-26 | Senate | Re-Referred to CPH. |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Referred to CPH, JDC. |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2018-01-19 | Senate | Introduced. |
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=2625&year=2018 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2018/bills/SB2625_.HTM |