HI SB2623 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-06 - Referred to CPC, JUD, referral sheet 28
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-06 - Referred to CPC, JUD, referral sheet 28
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Voids provisions in a franchise agreement with a Hawaii franchise that restricts the pre-dispute forum selection to a jurisdiction outside of Hawaii. Effective 07/01/2050. (SD1)
Title
Franchise; Franchisee; General Provisions; Forum Selection
Sponsors
Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] | Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. Kalani English [D] | Sen. Les Ihara [D] |
Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] | Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-06 | House | Referred to CPC, JUD, referral sheet 28 |
2014-03-06 | House | Pass First Reading |
2014-03-04 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 252) in amended form (SD 1). |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Slom . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2014-02-27 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-04-14. |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Reported from CPN/JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2495) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2014-02-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Nishihara, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Slom ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Taniguchi. |
2014-02-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Shimabukuro, Gabbard, Galuteria, Ihara, Solomon; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Slom ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2014-02-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN/JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-11-14 9:30AM in conference room 229. |
2014-01-21 | Senate | Referred to CPN/JDL. |
2014-01-21 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2014-01-17 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2041 (Same As) 2014-04-01 - The committee on JDL deferred the measure.