HI SB2621 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-1)
Status: Passed on June 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-27 - Act 135, on 06/27/2022 (Gov. Msg. No. 1236).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-1)
Status: Passed on June 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-27 - Act 135, on 06/27/2022 (Gov. Msg. No. 1236).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds to the Department of Agriculture to establish bovine tuberculosis control operations on Molokai, including staff, land, and equipment. (CD1)
Title
Relating To The Department Of Agriculture.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-27 - House - House Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - Senate - Senate Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-01 - House - House Finance: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-23 - House - House Agriculture: Passed, Unamended (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-31 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Environment: Passed, Unamended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - Senate - Senate Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-01 - House - House Finance: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-23 - House - House Agriculture: Passed, Unamended (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-31 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Environment: Passed, Unamended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-27 | House | Act 135, on 06/27/2022 (Gov. Msg. No. 1236). |
2022-06-27 | Senate | Act 135, 06/27/2022 (Gov. Msg. No. 1236). |
2022-05-06 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2022-05-05 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 824). |
2022-05-03 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 946). |
2022-05-03 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2022-05-03 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2022-04-29 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 05-03-22. |
2022-04-29 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 219-22) as amended in (CD 1). |
2022-04-29 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-03-22. |
2022-04-29 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 219-22). |
2022-04-27 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Hashem, Perruso, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2022-04-27 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Misalucha, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-27-22 6:00PM; Conference Room 325. |
2022-04-25 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-26-22 5:15PM; Conference Room 325. |
2022-04-20 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 729). |
2022-04-20 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Hashem, Perruso Co-Chairs; Matsumoto. |
2022-04-19 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 880). |
2022-04-19 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Gabbard Chair; Misalucha Co-Chair; Fevella. |
2022-04-14 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 871). |
2022-04-14 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2022-04-14 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 636). |
2022-04-12 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2022-04-08 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-12-22. |
2022-04-08 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1929-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2022-04-01 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Yamashita, Branco, Eli, Holt, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Marten, Nishimoto, Perruso, Sayama, Tam, Todd, Wildberger; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott. |
2022-03-28 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 04-01-22 1:30PM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference. |
2022-03-24 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ohno excused (1). |
2022-03-24 | House | Reported from AGR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1384-22), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2022-03-23 | House | The committees on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Hashem, Perruso, Lowen, Marten, Matayoshi, Todd, Tokioka, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2022-03-21 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by AGR on Wednesday, 03-23-22 9:00AM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference. |
2022-03-10 | House | Referred to AGR, FIN, referral sheet 24 |
2022-03-10 | House | Pass First Reading |
2022-03-08 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 268) in amended form (SD 1). |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Fevella). Transmitted to House. |
2022-03-04 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-08-22. |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2878) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2022-02-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Misalucha, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2022-02-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-22-22 10:00AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference. |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Reported from AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2295) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2022-01-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in AEN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Nishihara, Acasio, Rhoads, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2022-01-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 01-31-22 1:00PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference. |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Referred to AEN, WAM. |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Introduced. |