HI SB261 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-24 - (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting no (0) and Har, Riviere, Wooley excused (3).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-24 - (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting no (0) and Har, Riviere, Wooley excused (3).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the Museum of Music, Dance, and Cultural Arts design committee. Authorizes the committee to invite developers to prepare plans, specifications, and designs for the construction of a museum, and to review for approval the proposed museum development plans submitted by developers. Establishes a task force to develop the museum. Appropriates funds. Effective July 1, 2050. (SB261 HD1)
Title
Museum for music, Dance, and Cultural Arts; Appropriation
Sponsors
Sen. Kalani English [D] | Sen. Brickwood Galuteria [D] | Sen. Clayton Hee [D] | Sen. Gilbert Kahele [D] |
Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. Donna Kim [D] | Sen. Pohai Ryan [D] | Sen. Malama Solomon [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-24 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting no (0) and Har, Riviere, Wooley excused (3). | |
2011-03-24 | (H) Reported from HAW/CUA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1205) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. | |
2011-03-16 | (H) The committees on CUA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Wooley, Belatti, Hanohano, Jordan, C. Lee, Mizuno, Morikawa, Pine; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. | |
2011-03-16 | (H) The committees on HAW recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Hanohano, C. Lee, Belatti, Jordan, Mizuno, Morikawa, Wooley, Pine, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Yamane. | |
2011-03-11 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by HAW/CUA on Wednesday, 03-16-11 8:30AM in House conference room 329. | |
2011-03-10 | (H) Referred to HAW/CUA, FIN, referral sheet 33 | |
2011-03-10 | (H) Pass First Reading | |
2011-03-08 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 118) in amended form (SD 2). | |
2011-03-08 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Espero . Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Slom). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. | |
2011-03-04 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 03-08-11. | |
2011-03-04 | (S) Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 597) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). | |
2011-02-25 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 13 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Fukunaga, Kahele, Kim, Ryan, Tokuda, Wakai, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Espero ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Kouchi. | |
2011-02-22 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-25-11 9:00AM in conference room 211. | |
2011-02-18 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. | |
2011-02-18 | (S) Reported from HWN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 427) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. | |
2011-02-16 | (S) The committee(s) on HWN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HWN were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Galuteria, Ryan, English, Hee, Kahele, Kidani, Solomon; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom. | |
2011-02-11 | (S) The committee(s) on HWN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-16-11 3:00PM in conference room 224. | |
2011-02-11 | (S) Re-Referred to HWN, WAM. | |
2011-01-24 | (S) Referred to HWN/EDT, WAM. | |
2011-01-24 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2011-01-21 | (S) Introduced. |