HI SB2607 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-02 - Act 040, 04/29/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1140).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-02 - Act 040, 04/29/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1140).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Limits the ways in which the operator of a website, online service, online application, or mobile application working with the Department of Education can use student data. (SB2607 HD2)
Title
Student Data; Computer Services; Information Protection
Sponsors
Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. Donovan Cruz [D] | Sen. Breene Harimoto [D] | Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] |
Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] | Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-02 | Senate | Act 040, 04/29/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1140). |
2016-05-02 | House | Act 040, on 04/29/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1140). |
2016-04-15 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Received notice of change in conferees (Hse. Com. No. 621). |
2016-04-19 | House | House conferee(s) discharged: Representative(s) Say. |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 613). |
2016-04-18 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Takumi, McKelvey, Rhoads Co-Chairs; Ohno, Say, Matsumoto. |
2016-04-15 | House | Received notice of Senate agreement and Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 650). |
2016-04-15 | Senate | Passed Final Reading. 20 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 5 Excused: Senator(s) English, Harimoto, Keith-Agaran, Slom, L. Thielen. |
2016-04-14 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-15-16. |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Senate agrees with House amendments. Placed on the calendar for Final Reading on 04-15-16. |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Deferred until 04-14-16. |
2016-04-08 | Senate | Deferred until 04-12-16. |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Deferred until 04-08-16. |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 390). |
2016-04-06 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Rhoads, Thielen excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2016-04-04 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Wednesday, 04-06-16. |
2016-04-04 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1446-16) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2016-03-29 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, San Buenaventura, Brower, Creagan, Hashem, Kawakami, Morikawa, Nakashima, Takayama, Woodson; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, C. Lee, McDermott, Thielen. |
2016-03-29 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2016-03-24 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 03-29-16 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2016-03-24 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on JUD as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kawakami, Kong, Oshiro, Tokioka, Tupola, Woodson excused (6). |
2016-03-24 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1311-16) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to JUD. |
2016-03-23 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Woodson, Belatti, Brower, Creagan, Har, Hashem, C. Lee, Nakashima, San Buenaventura, Takayama, Yamane, Fukumoto Chang, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Kawakami, Oshiro. |
2016-03-22 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 03-23-16 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2016-03-21 | House | The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-23-16 at 2:00 PM. |
2016-03-18 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Monday, 03-21-16 3:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2016-03-18 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cachola, Kawakami, Kong, Tokioka excused (4). |
2016-03-18 | House | Reported from EDN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1083-16), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2016-03-16 | House | The committees on EDN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ohno, Choy, Ichiyama, Ing, Ito, Say, Tsuji, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Aquino, Kong, Tupola. |
2016-03-11 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EDN on Wednesday, 03-16-16 2:00PM in House conference room 309. |
2016-03-10 | House | Referred to EDN, CPC, JUD, referral sheet 26 |
2016-03-10 | House | Pass First Reading |
2016-03-08 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 208) in amended form (SD 2). |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Riviere). Transmitted to House. |
2016-03-03 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-08-16. |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2580) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2016-02-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Shimabukuro, K.Kahele, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard, Kim, L. Thielen. |
2016-02-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL will hold a public decision making on 02-25-16 9:01AM in conference room 016. |
2016-02-19 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL. |
2016-02-19 | Senate | Reported from EDU/EET (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2410) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDL. |
2016-02-17 | Senate | The committee(s) on EET recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EET were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Slom, Baker, Galuteria, Ihara, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Espero, Keith-Agaran, Ruderman. |
2016-02-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on EET will hold a public decision making on 02-17-16 1:20PM in conference room 414. |
2016-02-10 | Senate | The committee on EET deferred the measure. |
2016-02-10 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDU were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto, Slom. |
2016-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on EET deferred the measure until 02-10-16 1:15PM in conference room 414. |
2016-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU deferred the measure until 02-10-16 1:15PM in conference room 229. |
2016-02-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU/EET has scheduled a public hearing on 02-05-16 1:00PM in conference room 229. |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Referred to EDU/EET, JDL. |
2016-01-25 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2016-01-22 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1712 (Same As) 2016-02-09 - Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Tupola excused (1).