HI SB2601 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 14 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-14 - (H) Act 108, on 5/14/2010 (Gov. Msg. No. 322).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 14 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-14 - (H) Act 108, on 5/14/2010 (Gov. Msg. No. 322).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires a sunrise analysis for the regulation of athletic trainers, requires the auditor to submit reports of the requested analyses to the legislature prior to the 2011 session. (CD1)
Title
Athletic Trainers; Registration
Sponsors
Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. William Espero [D] | Sen. David Ige [D] | Sen. Les Ihara [D] |
Sen. Brian Taniguchi [D] | Sen. Jill Tokuda [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-14 | (H) Act 108, on 5/14/2010 (Gov. Msg. No. 322). | |
2010-05-14 | (S) Act 108, 5/14/2010 (Gov. Msg. No. 566). | |
2010-05-03 | (S) Enrolled to Governor. | |
2010-04-28 | (S) Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 630). | |
2010-04-27 | (H) Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 645). | |
2010-04-27 | (H) Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting no (0) and none excused (0). | |
2010-04-27 | (S) Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. | |
2010-04-26 | (S) Deferred until 04-27-10. | |
2010-04-26 | (H) Deferred to Tuesday, 04-27-10. | |
2010-04-23 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-26-10. | |
2010-04-23 | (H) Forty-eight (48) hours notice Monday, 04-26-10. | |
2010-04-23 | (H) Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 102-10) as amended in (CD 1). | |
2010-04-23 | (S) Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 102-10). | |
2010-04-23 | (H) The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Manahan, Tokioka, Chang, Marumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Wakai. | |
2010-04-23 | (S) The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 2 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Ige; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Hemmings. | |
2010-04-22 | (S) Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-23-10 11:00AM in conference room 423. | |
2010-04-20 | (S) Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-22-10 2:30PM in conference room 423. | |
2010-04-15 | (S) Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-20-10 2:30PM in conference room 423. | |
2010-04-14 | (S) Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-15-10 2:30PM in conference room 423. | |
2010-04-12 | (S) Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 557). | |
2010-04-12 | (H) House conferees appointed: Manahan, Wakai, Tokioka Co-Chairs; Chang, Marumoto. | |
2010-04-08 | (H) Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 534). | |
2010-04-08 | (H) Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 533). | |
2010-04-08 | (S) Senate Conferees appointed: Baker, Chair; Ige, Hemmings. | |
2010-04-08 | (S) Senate disagrees with House amendments. | |
2010-04-07 | (S) Deferred until 04-08-10. | |
2010-04-07 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 387). | |
2010-04-06 | (H) Passed Third Reading with none voting no (0) and Hanohano excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2010-04-01 | (H) Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1216-10), recommending passage on Third Reading. | |
2010-03-30 | (H) The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 17 Ayes: Representative(s) M. Oshiro, M. Lee, Aquino, Awana, Brower, Choy, Coffman, Har, Keith-Agaran, C. Lee, Nishimoto, Sagum, Tokioka, Wooley, Yamashita, Finnegan, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. | |
2010-03-26 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Monday, 03-29-10 6:00PM in House conference room 308. | |
2010-03-19 | (H) Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting no and Representative(s) Carroll, Chang, Har, Manahan, Morita, M. Oshiro, Tokioka, Ward excused. | |
2010-03-19 | (H) Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 850-10) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN. | |
2010-03-17 | (H) The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Herkes, Wakai, Belatti, Karamatsu, Luke, McKelvey, Morita, Souki, Tsuji, Marumoto, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Cabanilla, Carroll, Ito, Mizuno. | |
2010-03-12 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 03-17-10 2:00PM in House conference room 325. | |
2010-03-12 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting no (0) and Berg, Keith-Agaran, Manahan, Takumi, Thielen excused (5). | |
2010-03-12 | (H) Reported from TCI (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 737-10) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. | |
2010-03-09 | (H) The committees on TCI recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Manahan, Tokioka, Berg, Choy, Evans, McKelvey, Tsuji, Marumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Takai, Wakai, Wooley. | |
2010-03-08 | (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred to 03-09-10, 11:00 AM in room 312. | |
2010-03-04 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by TCI on Monday, 03-08-10 9:30AM in House conference room 312. | |
2010-03-03 | (H) Referred to TCI, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 33 | |
2010-03-03 | (H) Pass First Reading | |
2010-03-02 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 221) in amended form (SD 1). | |
2010-03-02 | (S) Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Bunda). Transmitted to House. | |
2010-02-26 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 03-02-10. | |
2010-02-26 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). | |
2010-02-26 | (S) Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2390) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. | |
2010-02-23 | (S) The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Ige, Espero, Green, Ihara, Sakamoto; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Hemmings. | |
2010-02-18 | (S) The committee on CPN has rescheduled its decision making 02-23-10 10:00AM in conference room 229. | |
2010-02-04 | (S) The committee(s) on CPN deferred the measure until 02-23-10 9:00am in conference room 229. | |
2010-01-29 | (S) The committee(s) on CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-04-10 9:00am in conference room 229. | |
2010-01-27 | (S) Referred to CPN. | |
2010-01-25 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2010-01-22 | (S) Introduced. |