HI SB2594 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-01 - The committee on HWN deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-01 - The committee on HWN deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires agencies that collect receipts for any disposition of the public land trust shall each fiscal quarter transfer to the department of Hawaiian home lands or the office of Hawaiian affairs twenty per cent of each receipt from the disposition. Returns certain moneys previously claimed as public land trust overpayments to the office of Hawaiian affairs. Establishes a public land trust revenues negotiating committee.
Title
Relating To Public Land Trust Funds.
Sponsors
Sen. Jarrett Keohokalole [D] | Sen. Laura Acasio [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] |
Sen. Les Ihara [D] | Sen. Donna Kim [D] | Sen. Gil Riviere [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-01 | Senate | The committee on HWN deferred the measure. |
2022-02-01 | Senate | The committee on GVO deferred the measure. |
2022-01-28 | Senate | Re-Referred to HWN/GVO, WAM/JDC. |
2022-01-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on HWN/GVO has scheduled a public hearing on 02-01-22 1:00PM; Via Videoconference. |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Referred to HWN/GVO, WAM. |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Introduced. |
Subjects
Department of Hawaiian Home Lands
Office of Hawaiian Affairs
Public Land Trust
Public Land Trust Revenues Negotiating Committee
Transfer of Moneys
Office of Hawaiian Affairs
Public Land Trust
Public Land Trust Revenues Negotiating Committee
Transfer of Moneys
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=2594&year=2022 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2022/bills/SB2594_.HTM |