HI SB2587 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Tuesday 03-17-20 2:00PM in conference room 329.
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Tuesday 03-17-20 2:00PM in conference room 329.
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes regulatory framework for small dollar lenders in article 9 of chapter 412, HRS. Specifies various consumer protection requirements for small dollar loans. Beginning 1/1/2022, requires licensure for small dollar lenders that offer small dollar loans to consumers. Specifies licensing requirements for small dollar lenders. Authorizes the division of financial institutions to appoint 2.0 FTE examiner positions, funded via the compliance resolution fund, to carry out the purposes of the small dollar installment loan program. Requires check cashers to be registered with DCCA and to offer a voluntary payment plan to customers under certain circumstances. Establishes the terms of voluntary payment plans. Clarifies that a customer may only have one outstanding deferred deposit transaction from any source. Amends notices to customers required of check cashers. Removes the exemption for persons engaged in the bona fide retail sale of goods or services. Requires the Auditor to conduct an analysis of the regulation of payday lenders and deferred deposit agreements in the State. Effective 7/1/2050. (HD1)
Title
Relating To Consumer Protection.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-12 - House - House Intrastate Commerce: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - Senate - Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health: Passed, Unamended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - Senate - Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health: Passed, Unamended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-16 | House | This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Tuesday 03-17-20 2:00PM in conference room 329. |
2020-03-13 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Tuesday, 03-17-20 2:00PM in House conference room 329. |
2020-03-13 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Gates, McDermott, Thielen excused (3). |
2020-03-13 | House | Reported from IAC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1089-20) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2020-03-12 | House | The committees on IAC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Ohno, D. Kobayashi, Kong, Nishimoto, Takayama; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Gates, McDermott. |
2020-03-09 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by IAC on Thursday, 03-12-20 9:30AM in House conference room 430. |
2020-03-09 | House | Referred to IAC, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 36 |
2020-03-05 | House | Pass First Reading |
2020-03-03 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 289) in amended form (SD 1). |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-03-20. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3300) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2020-02-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Harimoto, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 4 Excused: Senator(s) English, Inouye, K. Kahele, Taniguchi. |
2020-02-18 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-20-20 1:00PM in conference room 211. |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2608) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2020-02-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in CPH were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, S. Chang, Nishihara, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2020-01-30 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-06-20 9:30AM in conference room 229. |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Referred to CPH, WAM. |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1883 (Same As) 2020-01-23 - Referred to IAC, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 3
Subjects
Appropriation
Check Cashers
DCCA
Licensure
Notices ($)
Payday Lending
Registration
Requirements
Small Dollar Lenders
Small Dollar Loans
Voluntary Payment Plans
Check Cashers
DCCA
Licensure
Notices ($)
Payday Lending
Registration
Requirements
Small Dollar Lenders
Small Dollar Loans
Voluntary Payment Plans