HI SB2583 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on July 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-13 - Act 239, on 07/12/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1348).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on July 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-13 - Act 239, on 07/12/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1348).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Mandates the counties to approve the installation and use of composting toilets in areas that are inaccessible to municipal wastewater systems. (CD1)
Title
Counties; Wastewater; Individual Systems
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-13 | House | Act 239, on 07/12/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1348). |
2016-07-13 | Senate | Act 239, 07/12/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1348). |
2016-04-29 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2016-04-29 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 669). |
2016-04-28 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 709). |
2016-04-28 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2016-04-28 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 23 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 2 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto, Slom. |
2016-04-26 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Thursday, 04-28-16. |
2016-04-26 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 6-16) as amended in (CD 1). |
2016-04-26 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-28-16. |
2016-04-26 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 6-16). |
2016-04-22 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Morikawa, Kobayashi, Creagan; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott. |
2016-04-22 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Gabbard, English; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom. |
2016-04-22 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04/22/16 10:45am in conference room 312. |
2016-04-20 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Friday, 04-22-16 9:00AM in conference room 229. |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Received notice of change in conferees (Hse. Com. No. 620). |
2016-04-19 | House | House conferee(s) replaced: Representative(s) McDermott replaced Representative(s) Fukumoto Chang as conferee(s). |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 613). |
2016-04-18 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 653). |
2016-04-18 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Morikawa, Kobayashi Co-Chairs; Creagan, Fukumoto Chang. |
2016-04-18 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Nishihara Chair; Gabbard, English Co-Chairs; Slom. |
2016-04-14 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 649). |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 552). |
2016-04-12 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ing, McDermott, Thielen excused (3). Transmitted to Senate. |
2016-04-08 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-12-16. |
2016-04-08 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1648-16) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2016-04-05 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cachola, Cullen, DeCoite, Johanson, Jordan, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, Onishi, Tokioka, Yamashita, Pouha, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2016-04-05 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2016-04-02 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 04-05-16 2:30PM in conference room 308. |
2016-04-01 | House | The committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until Tuesday, 04-05-16 at 2:30PM. |
2016-03-30 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 04-01-16 3:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2016-03-24 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kawakami, Kong, Oshiro, Tokioka, Tupola, Woodson excused (6). |
2016-03-24 | House | Reported from HUS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1226-16), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2016-03-22 | House | The committees on HUS recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Morikawa, Kobayashi, Belatti, Creagan, Hashem, Jordan, Oshiro, Fukumoto Chang; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2016-03-21 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2016-03-18 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HUS on Tuesday, 03-22-16 10:00AM in House conference room 329. |
2016-03-10 | House | Referred to HUS, FIN, referral sheet 26 |
2016-03-10 | House | Pass First Reading |
2016-03-08 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 204). |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Ihara . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Riviere). Transmitted to House. |
2016-03-04 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-08-16. |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2682) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2016-02-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Dela Cruz, Chun Oakland, English, Harimoto, Inouye, Riviere, Taniguchi, Wakai, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Galuteria. |
2016-02-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-25-16 1:00PM in conference room 211. |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Reported from PSM/WLA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2322) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2016-02-10 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in PSM were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Espero, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Baker, Inouye. |
2016-02-10 | Senate | The committee(s) on WLA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WLA were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Nishihara, L. Thielen, Wakai, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 4 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Riviere, Ruderman, Shimabukuro. |
2016-02-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM/WLA has scheduled a public hearing on 02-10-16 2:45PM in conference room 224. |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Referred to PSM/WLA, WAM. |
2016-01-25 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2016-01-22 | Senate | Introduced. |