HI SB2575 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 1 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-05-03 - Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 830).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on May 1 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-05-03 - Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 830).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits the mining, extraction, and removal of minerals from the seabed in all state marine waters, with certain exemptions. Prohibits the issuance of any permit for or in connection with the development or operation of any facility or infrastructure associated with the mining, extraction, or removal of minerals from the seabed within state marine waters. (CD1)
Title
Relating To The Environment.
Sponsors
Sen. Chris Lee [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-24 - Senate - Senate Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 2 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-24 - House - House Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, Unamended (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-05 - Senate - Senate Water and Land: Passed, Unamended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-05 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Environment: Passed, Unamended (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-24 - House - House Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, Unamended (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-05 - Senate - Senate Water and Land: Passed, Unamended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-05 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Environment: Passed, Unamended (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-03 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 830). |
2024-05-02 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2024-05-01 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 798). |
2024-05-01 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ganaden, Martinez, Nakashima excused (3). |
2024-05-01 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2024-04-25 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Wednesday, 05-01-24. |
2024-04-25 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 65-24) as amended in (CD 1). |
2024-04-25 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-01-24. |
2024-04-25 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 65-24). |
2024-04-24 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Ichiyama, Poepoe, Cochran; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ward. |
2024-04-24 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 2 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Rhoads; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Inouye. |
2024-04-23 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-24-24 9:00AM; Conference Room 325. |
2024-04-22 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 791). |
2024-04-19 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Lowen, Ichiyama, Poepoe Co-Chairs; Cochran, Ward. |
2024-04-17 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 686). |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Gabbard Chair; Inouye, Rhoads Co-Chairs. |
2024-04-09 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 670). |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 668). |
2024-04-05 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Souza excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2024-04-05 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1811-24), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2024-04-02 | House | The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Kitagawa, Aiu, Chun, Cochran, Garrett, Kahaloa, Kila, Lamosao, Morikawa, Nishimoto, Poepoe, Takenouchi, Alcos, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Kobayashi. |
2024-03-29 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 04-02-24 4:00PM in House conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-03-21 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Martinez, Nakashima excused (2). |
2024-03-21 | House | Reported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1269-24), recommending referral to FIN. |
2024-03-19 | House | The committee on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Ichiyama, Poepoe, Chun, Ganaden, Hashem, M. Mizuno, Morikawa, Souza; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Takayama. |
2024-03-15 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL on Tuesday, 03-19-24 9:30AM in House conference room 430 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-03-14 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on WAL with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Alcos, Martinez, Quinlan excused (3). |
2024-03-14 | House | Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1078-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to WAL. |
2024-03-12 | House | The committee on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Cochran, Kahaloa, Perruso; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Gates, Woodson, Ward. |
2024-03-08 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Tuesday, 03-12-24 9:00AM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-03-07 | House | Referred to EEP, WAL, FIN, referral sheet 16 |
2024-03-07 | House | Pass First Reading |
2024-03-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 155). |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2024-03-01 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-05-24. |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2947) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2024-02-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDC were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Elefante, San Buenaventura; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard, Awa. |
2024-02-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 02-28-24 10:00AM; Conference Room 016 & Videoconference. |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC. |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Reported from AEN/WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2400) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to JDC. |
2024-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in AEN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, DeCoite, Rhoads, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Richards. |
2024-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WTL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Elefante, Chang, McKelvey, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2024-02-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN/WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-05-24 1:15PM; CR 229 & Videoconference. |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Referred to AEN/WTL, JDC. |
2024-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2024-01-19 | Senate | Introduced. |