HI SB2561 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-09 - (S) The committee on PSM deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-09 - (S) The committee on PSM deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Regulates the retail and wholesale sales of spray paint. Designates the department of public safety with jurisdiction.
Title
Public Safety; Spray Paint Sales
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-09 | (S) The committee on PSM deferred the measure. | |
2010-02-03 | (S) The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-09-10 1:25pm in conference room 229. | |
2010-01-27 | (S) Referred to PSM, JGO. | |
2010-01-25 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2010-01-22 | (S) Introduced. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://capitol.hawaii.gov/Archives/measure_indiv_Archives.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=2561&year=2010 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2010/Bills/SB2561_.HTM |