HI SB2546 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-19 - (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with Representative(s) Hanohano voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Belatti voting no (1) and Representative(s) Carroll, Ching, Herkes, Mizuno excused (4).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-19 - (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with Representative(s) Hanohano voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Belatti voting no (1) and Representative(s) Carroll, Ching, Herkes, Mizuno excused (4).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the form and function of the University of Hawaii Regents Candidate Advisory Council. Effective July 1, 2050. (SB2546 HD1)
Title
University of Hawaii Board of Regents; Candidate Advisory Council
Sponsors
Sen. Suzanne Chun Oakland [D] | Sen. Brickwood Galuteria [D] | Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. Donna Kim [D] |
Sen. Ronald Kouchi [D] | Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] | Sen. Jill Tokuda [D] | Sen. Shan Tsutsui [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-19 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with Representative(s) Hanohano voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Belatti voting no (1) and Representative(s) Carroll, Ching, Herkes, Mizuno excused (4). | |
2012-03-19 | (H) Reported from HED (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1098-12) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. | |
2012-03-13 | (H) The committees on HED recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Nishimoto, Nakashima, Aquino, Awana, Hanohano, Saiki, Takai, Takumi, Johanson; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Belatti; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Chang, Mizuno, Wooley, Ching. | |
2012-03-09 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by HED on Tuesday, 03-13-12 2:00PM in House conference room 309. | |
2012-03-08 | (H) Referred to HED, JUD, referral sheet 41 | |
2012-03-08 | (H) Pass First Reading | |
2012-03-06 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 225) in amended form (SD 2). | |
2012-03-06 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. | |
2012-03-02 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 03-06-12. | |
2012-03-02 | (S) Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2613) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). | |
2012-02-23 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 14 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Espero, Fukunaga, Kahele, Kim, Kouchi, Ryan, Tokuda, Wakai, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. | |
2012-02-16 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on on 02-23-12 9:00AM in conference room 211. | |
2012-02-13 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. | |
2012-02-13 | (S) Reported from EDU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2131) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. | |
2012-02-08 | (S) The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDU were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Kidani, Nishihara, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Chun Oakland ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Taniguchi. | |
2012-01-31 | (S) The committee(s) on EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 02-08-12 1:15PM in conference room 225. | |
2012-01-23 | (S) Referred to EDU, WAM. | |
2012-01-23 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2012-01-20 | (S) Introduced. |