HI SB2544 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-14 - The committee on EDU deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-14 - The committee on EDU deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the Safe Routes to School advisory committee to develop a strategic plan for the Safe Routes to School Program by 11/1/2025. Appropriates funds for the hiring of a full-time Safe Routes to School coordinator.
Title
Relating To Safe Routes To School.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-14 | Senate | The committee on EDU deferred the measure. |
2022-02-14 | Senate | The committee on TRS deferred the measure. |
2022-02-10 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRS/EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 02-14-22 3:00PM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference. |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Referred to TRS/EDU, WAM. |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Introduced. |
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=2544&year=2022 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2022/bills/SB2544_.HTM |