HI SB2544 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-23 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kawakami, Kong, Pouha excused (3).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-23 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kawakami, Kong, Pouha excused (3).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a tiered scale for the biennial renewal fees for professional employer organizations, based on the number of covered employees a professional employer organization reports to the department of labor and industrial relations. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD2)
Title
Professional Employer Organizations; Department of Labor and Industrial Relations; Covered Employees; Fees
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-23 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kawakami, Kong, Pouha excused (3). |
2016-03-23 | House | Reported from LAB/CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1184-16) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2016-03-21 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Woodson, Belatti, Brower, Creagan, Hashem, C. Lee, Nakashima, San Buenaventura, Takayama, Yamane, Fukumoto Chang; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Har, Kawakami, Oshiro, McDermott. |
2016-03-21 | House | The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Keohokalole, Ichiyama, San Buenaventura, Yamashita, Tupola; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 5 Excused: Representative(s) Aquino, Har, Johanson, LoPresti, Takumi. |
2016-03-17 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB/CPC on Monday, 03-21-16 2:50PM in House conference room 325. |
2016-03-15 | House | Re-referred to LAB/CPC, FIN, referral sheet 29 |
2016-03-10 | House | Referred to CPC, FIN, referral sheet 26 |
2016-03-10 | House | Pass First Reading |
2016-03-08 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 189) in amended form (SD 2). |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Slom). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Riviere). Transmitted to House. |
2016-03-04 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-08-16. |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2793) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2016-03-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Dela Cruz, Chun Oakland, English, Harimoto, Inouye, Riviere, Taniguchi, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Galuteria, Slom. |
2016-02-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 03-01-16 9:05AM in conference room 211. |
2016-02-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-24-16 1:15PM in conference room 211. |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2222) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2016-02-10 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Kidani, Espero, Nishihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara, Ruderman, Slom. |
2016-02-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH deferred the measure until 02-10-16 10:30AM in conference room 229. |
2016-01-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-01-16 9:00AM in conference room 229. |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Referred to CPH, WAM. |
2016-01-25 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2016-01-22 | Senate | Introduced. |