HI SB2534 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-23 - Referred to CPH/WTL, JDC.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-23 - Referred to CPH/WTL, JDC.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires that mandatory seller disclosures in real estate transactions include identification of residential real properties lying within the sea level rise exposure area as officially designated by the Hawaii Climate Change Mitigation and Adaptation Commission, subject to the availability of county maps designating the areas by tax map key. Effective 11/1/2020.
Title
Relating To Real Property Transactions.
Sponsors
Sen. Kaiali'i Kahele [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] | Sen. Les Ihara [D] |
Sen. Dru Kanuha [D] | Sen. Jarrett Keohokalole [D] | Sen. Gil Riviere [D] | Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-23 | Senate | Referred to CPH/WTL, JDC. |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Introduced. |
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=2534&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/SB2534_.HTM |