HI SB2528 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-09 - (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-09 - (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the state executive branch to offer a voluntary severance or a special retirement incentive benefit to state employees who elect to voluntarily separate from service when their positions are identified for abolishment or when they are directly affected by a reduction-in-force or workforce restructuring plan; extends to other jurisdictions the option to provide a special retirement incentive to their respective employees under a reduction-in-force or a workforce restructuring plan. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD1)
Title
Public Employment; Separation Incentives
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Bunda [D] | Sen. William Espero [D] | Sen. Brickwood Galuteria [D] | Sen. David Ige [D] |
Sen. Russell Kokubun [D] | Sen. Dwight Takamine [D] | Sen. Shan Tsutsui [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-09 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. | |
2010-02-09 | (S) Reported from LBR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2096) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. | |
2010-02-04 | (S) The committee(s) on LBR recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in LBR were as follows: 2 Aye(s): Senator(s) Takamine, Taniguchi; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Bunda, Hee. | |
2010-02-01 | (S) The committee(s) on LBR has scheduled a public hearing on 02-04-10 2:45pm in conference room 224. | |
2010-01-25 | (S) Referred to LBR, WAM. | |
2010-01-25 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2010-01-22 | (S) Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2429 (Same As) 2010-03-19 - (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.