HI SB2498 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-23 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Cachola, Har voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Kong voting no (1) and Representative(s) C. Lee, Lowen, McDermott, Souki, Tokioka excused (5).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-23 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Cachola, Har voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Kong voting no (1) and Representative(s) C. Lee, Lowen, McDermott, Souki, Tokioka excused (5).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits the sale of polystyrene foam containers and serving of prepared foods using polystyrene foam containers statewide. Authorizes the Department of Health to adopt rules to implement the prohibition and include within its administrative rules a requirement for prepared food vendors to educate their customers about proper disposal of nonreusable food containers and litter reduction. (SB2498 HD1)
Title
Relating To Polystyrene Foam Containers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-23 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Cachola, Har voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Kong voting no (1) and Representative(s) C. Lee, Lowen, McDermott, Souki, Tokioka excused (5). |
2018-03-23 | House | Reported from EEP/HHS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1382-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2018-03-16 | House | The committees on HHS recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, Kobayashi, Belatti, Learmont; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Tupola. |
2018-03-16 | House | The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, Cullen, Todd, Yamane; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Kong; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Lowen, McKelvey, McDermott. |
2018-03-13 | House | Bill re-scheduled to be heard by EEP/HHS on Friday, 03-16-18 9:00AM in conference room 329. |
2018-03-13 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP/HHS on Friday, 03-16-18 9:30AM in House conference room 329. |
2018-03-08 | House | Referred to EEP/HHS, FIN, referral sheet 35 |
2018-03-08 | House | Pass First Reading |
2018-03-06 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 197) in amended form (SD 2). |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Wakai . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2018-03-01 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-06-18. |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2597) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2018-02-26 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Tokuda, S. Chang, Espero, Nishihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara, Ruderman. |
2018-02-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH will hold a public decision making on 02-26-18 10:00AM in conference room 229. |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPH. |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Reported from AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2046) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to CPH. |
2018-02-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AEN were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, K. Rhoads, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Riviere, Nishihara. |
2018-01-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-01-18 2:30PM in conference room 016. |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Referred to AEN, CPH. |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2018-01-19 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1937 (Same As) 2018-01-22 - Referred to EEP/HHS, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 5
Subjects
Disposal of Nonreusable Prepared Food Containers
Litter Reduction
Polystyrene Foam Products
Prohibition
Litter Reduction
Polystyrene Foam Products
Prohibition