HI SB2496 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-24 - Referred to HHS/WTL, WAM.
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-24 - Referred to HHS/WTL, WAM.
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a gray water income tax credit to encourage the installation of qualified gray water systems certified by the Department of Health on existing residential properties and new housing developments. Effective for taxable years beginning after 12/31/2024. Repeals 1/1/2035.
Title
Relating To Gray Water Income Tax Credit.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-24 | Senate | Referred to HHS/WTL, WAM. |
2024-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2024-01-19 | Senate | Introduced. |
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=2496&year=2024 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2024/bills/SB2496_.HTM |