HI SB2495 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-20 - The committee on CPH deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-20 - The committee on CPH deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires a used motor vehicle dealer to deliver at least two operable sets of keys, including keys fobs, to the consumer at the time of sale. Includes keys and key fobs as covered parts under required written warranties.
Title
Relating To Used Motor Vehicles.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-20 | Senate | The committee on CPH deferred the measure. |
2020-02-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-20-20 9:00AM in conference room 229. |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Referred to CPH. |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Introduced. |
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=2495&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/SB2495_.HTM |