HI SB2493 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-21 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ing, C. Lee, McKelvey, Souki, Todd, Ward excused (6).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-21 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ing, C. Lee, McKelvey, Souki, Todd, Ward excused (6).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Postpones until 1/1/2020 the effective date of certain provisions of Act 152, Session Laws of Hawaii 2017, that conform Hawaii's insurance producer licensing requirements to national model standards by eliminating the ability of insurance producers to appoint other producers to act as an agent of an insurer. (SB2493 HD1)
Title
Relating To Insurance.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-21 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ing, C. Lee, McKelvey, Souki, Todd, Ward excused (6). |
2018-03-21 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1253-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2018-03-14 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ichiyama, Aquino, Ito, Johanson, LoPresti, Mizuno, Say, Tokioka, Yamane; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott. |
2018-03-09 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 03-14-18 2:00PM in House conference room 329. |
2018-03-08 | House | Referred to CPC, FIN, referral sheet 35 |
2018-03-08 | House | Pass First Reading |
2018-03-06 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 193) in amended form (SD 2). |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2018-03-02 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-06-18. |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2733) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2018-02-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele, Kidani, Riviere, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Shimabukuro. |
2018-02-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-23-18 11:00AM in conference room 211. |
2018-02-09 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2018-02-09 | Senate | Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2150) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2018-02-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, S. Chang, Espero, Ihara, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Tokuda, Nishihara. |
2018-01-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-06-18 9:00AM in conference room 229. |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Re-Referred to CPH, WAM. |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Referred to CPH/JDC, WAM. |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2018-01-19 | Senate | Introduced. |