HI SB2491 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-09 - Re-referred to LAB, LMG, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 37
Pending: House Labor & Public Employment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Provides family leave insurance benefits and extends period of family leave to 16 weeks for businesses that employs one or more employees who meet the hourly qualifications. Appropriates funds. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD2)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Family Leave.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate Labor, Culture and the Arts: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-09HouseRe-referred to LAB, LMG, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 37
2020-03-09HouseReferred to LAB, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 36
2020-03-05HousePass First Reading
2020-03-03HouseReceived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 258) in amended form (SD 2).
2020-03-03SenatePassed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella, Kim, Moriwaki, Riviere . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
2020-03-03SenateReconsideration of previous Third Reading vote taken on 03-03-20.
2020-03-03SenateReport Adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella, Kim, Riviere. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
2020-02-28Senate48 Hrs. Notice 03-03-20.
2020-02-28SenateReported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3386) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
2020-02-20SenateThe committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Harimoto, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Moriwaki, Riviere, Fevella ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) English, K. Kahele.
2020-02-14SenateThe committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-20-20 10:35AM in conference room 211.
2020-02-14SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
2020-02-14SenateReported from LCA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2805) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
2020-02-04SenateThe committee(s) on LCA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in LCA were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, Ihara, S. Chang, Gabbard, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2020-01-31SenateThe committee(s) on LCA has scheduled a public hearing on 02-04-20 2:45PM in conference room 224.
2020-01-23SenateReferred to LCA, WAM.
2020-01-21SenatePassed First Reading.
2020-01-17SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

HB2219 (Same As) 2020-02-04 - The committee(s) on LAB recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback