HI SB2482 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-20 - The committee on CPH deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-20 - The committee on CPH deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Specifies that the performance of any new work in the craft or trade of structural steel contractors shall not be considered incidental and supplemental.
Title
Relating To Contractors.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-20 | Senate | The committee on CPH deferred the measure. |
2020-02-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-20-20 9:00AM in conference room 229. |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Referred to CPH. |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Introduced. |
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=2482&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/SB2482_.HTM |