HI SB2462 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-10 - Referred to WAL, FIN, referral sheet 26
Pending: House Water & Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-10 - Referred to WAL, FIN, referral sheet 26
Pending: House Water & Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the board of land and natural resources to transfer the operation, administration, management, and maintenance of Honokohau small boat harbor to a public-private partnership or a private organization. Appropriates funds for repairs and maintenance of the harbor. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD2)
Title
Board of Land and Natural Resources; Honokohau Small Boat Harbor; Appropriation ($)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-10 | House | Referred to WAL, FIN, referral sheet 26 |
2016-03-10 | House | Pass First Reading |
2016-03-08 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 174) in amended form (SD 2). |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Inouye . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Riviere). Transmitted to House. |
2016-03-04 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-08-16. |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2713) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2016-03-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Dela Cruz, Chun Oakland, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, Riviere, Wakai, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Taniguchi. |
2016-02-26 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-01-16 1:30PM in conference room 211. |
2016-02-05 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2016-02-05 | Senate | Reported from WLA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2034) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2016-02-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on WLA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WLA were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Nishihara, Riviere, Ruderman, Shimabukuro, L. Thielen, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Wakai. |
2016-01-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on WLA has scheduled a public hearing on 02-01-16 2:45PM in conference room 224. |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Referred to WLA, WAM. |
2016-01-25 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2016-01-22 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2235 (Same As) 2016-04-29 - Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday, 04-29-16 at 5:00PM in Conference Room 224.