HI SB2450 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-12 - The committee on EET deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Water, Land, and Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Prohibits individuals from releasing, feeding, watering, or otherwise caring for unrestrained predators on state lands. Establishes administrative fines for individuals that violate this prohibition. Exempts hunters that deploy, feed, or water unrestrained dogs in the course of hunting.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Predator Control; Natural Resources

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-02-12SenateThe committee on EET deferred the measure.
2016-02-12SenateThe committee on WLA deferred the measure.
2016-02-02SenateThe committee(s) on WLA/EET has scheduled a public hearing on 02-12-16 2:00PM in conference room 414.
2016-01-27SenateReferred to WLA/EET, WAM.
2016-01-25SenatePassed First Reading.
2016-01-22SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

HB2118 (Same As) 2016-01-27 - Referred to WAL, JUD, referral sheet 2

Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback