HI SB2449 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-1)
Status: Passed on May 7 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-07 - (S) Act 085, 5/7/2010 (Gov. Msg. No. 543).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-1)
Status: Passed on May 7 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-07 - (S) Act 085, 5/7/2010 (Gov. Msg. No. 543).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Makes the statutory requirements for provisional driver's licenses for persons under the age of eighteen permanent. Permits a provisional licensee to receive a driver's license upon turning eighteen years of age. (CD1)
Title
Driver Licensing; Provisional License
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-07 | (S) Act 085, 5/7/2010 (Gov. Msg. No. 543). | |
2010-05-07 | (H) Act 085, on 5/7/2010 (Gov. Msg. No. 297). | |
2010-05-03 | (S) Enrolled to Governor. | |
2010-04-28 | (S) Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 630). | |
2010-04-27 | (H) Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 645). | |
2010-04-27 | (H) Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting no (0) and none excused (0). | |
2010-04-27 | (S) Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. | |
2010-04-26 | (H) Deferred to Tuesday, 04-27-10. | |
2010-04-23 | (S) Deferred until 04-27-10. | |
2010-04-23 | (H) Deferred to Monday, 04-26-10. | |
2010-04-21 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-23-10. | |
2010-04-21 | (H) Forty-eight (48) hours notice Friday, 04-23-10. | |
2010-04-21 | (H) Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 60-10) as amended in (CD 1). | |
2010-04-21 | (S) Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 60-10). | |
2010-04-19 | (H) The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Souki, Karamatsu, Awana, Pine; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Saiki. | |
2010-04-19 | (S) The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 2 Aye(s): Senator(s) English, Nishihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom. | |
2010-04-14 | (S) Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-19-10 1:30PM in conference room 225. | |
2010-04-12 | (S) Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 557). | |
2010-04-12 | (H) House conferees appointed: Souki, Karamatsu Co-Chairs; Awana, Saiki, Pine. | |
2010-04-07 | (H) Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 496). | |
2010-04-07 | (S) Senate Conferees appointed: English, Chair; Nishihara, Slom. | |
2010-04-06 | (H) Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 487). | |
2010-04-06 | (S) Senate disagrees with House amendments. | |
2010-04-01 | (S) Deferred until 04-06-10. | |
2010-04-01 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 305). | |
2010-03-31 | (H) Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 1 with none voting no (0) and Chong, Morita, Souki excused (3). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2010-03-29 | (H) Forty-eight (48) hours notice Wednesday, 03-31-10. | |
2010-03-29 | (H) Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1042-10) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Third Reading. | |
2010-03-18 | (H) The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Karamatsu, Ito, Belatti, Herkes, Luke, McKelvey, Mizuno, Souki, Tsuji, Wakai, Marumoto, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Cabanilla, Carroll, Morita, B. Oshiro. | |
2010-03-16 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Thursday, 03-18-10 2:45PM in House conference room 325. | |
2010-03-12 | (H) Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting no (0) and Berg, Keith-Agaran, Manahan, Takumi, Thielen excused (5). | |
2010-03-12 | (H) Reported from TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 717-10), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. | |
2010-03-08 | (H) The committees on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Souki, Awana, Aquino, Hanohano, Keith-Agaran, Nakashima, Saiki, Yamashita, Pine; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) M. Lee, Rhoads, Takumi. | |
2010-03-04 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by TRN on Monday, 03-08-10 9:30AM in House conference room 309. | |
2010-02-19 | (H) This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Tuesday 02-23-10 2:00PM in conference room 325. | |
2010-02-19 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 02-23-10 2:00PM in House conference room 325. | |
2010-02-10 | (H) Referred to TRN, JUD, referral sheet 26 | |
2010-02-09 | (H) Pass First Reading | |
2010-02-08 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 13). | |
2010-02-08 | (S) Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Tokuda). Transmitted to House. | |
2010-02-05 | (S) One Day Notice 02-08-10. | |
2010-02-05 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading. | |
2010-02-05 | (S) Reported from TIA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2040) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. | |
2010-02-01 | (S) The committee(s) on TIA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in TIA were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) English, Gabbard, Espero, Nishihara, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. | |
2010-01-28 | (S) The committee(s) on TIA has scheduled a public hearing on 02-01-10 1:15 PM in conference room 224. | |
2010-01-25 | (S) Referred to TIA. | |
2010-01-25 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2010-01-22 | (S) Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2404 (Same As) 2010-03-03 - (S) Referred to TIA, JGO.