HI SB2444 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-08 - (H) Referred to CPC/JUD, FIN, referral sheet 41
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-08 - (H) Referred to CPC/JUD, FIN, referral sheet 41
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Implements the amendments to article 9 of the Uniform Commercial Code, relating to secured transactions, set forth by the Uniform Law Commission. (SD1)
Title
Uniform Commercial Code; Secured Transactions
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-08 | (H) Referred to CPC/JUD, FIN, referral sheet 41 | |
2012-03-08 | (H) Pass First Reading | |
2012-03-06 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 187) in amended form (SD 1). | |
2012-03-06 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. | |
2012-03-02 | (S) Deferred until 03-06-12. | |
2012-03-01 | (S) One Day Notice 03-02-12. | |
2012-03-01 | (S) Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2506) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. | |
2012-02-14 | (S) The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDL were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Shimabukuro, Gabbard; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara, Slom. | |
2012-02-10 | (S) The committee(s) on JDL will hold a public decision making on 02-14-12 9:30AM in conference room 016. | |
2012-02-07 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL. | |
2012-02-07 | (S) Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2040) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDL. | |
2012-02-03 | (S) The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Taniguchi, Galuteria, Green, Nishihara, Solomon, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. | |
2012-01-27 | (S) The committee(s) on CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-03-12 9:00AM in conference room 229. | |
2012-01-23 | (S) Referred to CPN, JDL. | |
2012-01-23 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2012-01-20 | (S) Introduced. |