HI SB244 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides a refund or store credit to retail establishment customers who do not use plastic shopping bags offered by the retail establishment at no additional charge.
Title
Plastic Shopping Bags; Refund; Credit; Solid Waste Management
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-11 | Carried over to 2010 Regular Session. | |
2009-02-12 | (S) The committee on ENE deferred the measure. | |
2009-02-11 | (S) The committee(s) on ENE deferred the measure until 02-12-09 2:45 PM in conference room 225. | |
2009-02-02 | (S) The committee(s) on ENE has scheduled a public hearing on 02-05-09 4:15 PM in conference room 225. | |
2009-01-28 | (S) Referred to ENE, CPN. | |
2009-01-26 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2009-01-23 | (S) Introduced. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://capitol.hawaii.gov/Archives/measure_indiv_Archives.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=244&year=2010 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2010/Bills/SB244_.HTM |