HI SB2431 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-22 - The committee on JDC deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-22 - The committee on JDC deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Allows a court to choose from 1 to 3 qualified examiners in felony cases in which a defendant's fitness to proceed is in doubt. Requires that at least 1 of the examiners is a psychiatrist or licensed psychologist. Removes the requirement that 1 of the 3 examiners shall be a psychiatrist or licensed psychologist designated by the director of health.
Title
Relating To Qualified Examiners.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-22 | Senate | The committee on JDC deferred the measure. |
2018-02-22 | Senate | The committee on CPH deferred the measure. |
2018-02-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC/CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-22-18 9:00AM in conference room 229. |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Referred to JDC/CPH. |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2018-01-19 | Senate | Introduced. |
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=2431&year=2018 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2018/bills/SB2431_.HTM |