HI SB2431 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on July 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-08 - Vetoed on 07-08-14 - Returned from the Governor without approval (Gov. Msg. No. 1308).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on July 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-08 - Vetoed on 07-08-14 - Returned from the Governor without approval (Gov. Msg. No. 1308).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Makes permanent the exemptions granted to the Hawaii Tourism Authority, under certain conditions, from the supervision of accounts by the Comptroller, requirements for publication of consolidated financial statements, and approval of business and accounting forms. Also makes permanent the deposit of interest and revenues or receipts into the tourism special fund. (SB2431 HD1)
Title
Hawaii Tourism Authority
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-08 | Senate | Vetoed on 07-08-14 - Returned from the Governor without approval (Gov. Msg. No. 1308). |
2014-07-08 | House | Vetoed (Gov. Msg. No. 1308). |
2014-06-23 | House | Notice of intent to veto (Gov. Msg. No. 1224) |
2014-06-23 | Senate | Notice of Intent to veto dated 06-23-14 (Gov. Msg. No. 1224) |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2014-04-16 | House | Received notice of reconsideration, Senate agreement, and Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 683). |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Passed Final Reading. 24 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 1 No(es): Senator(s) L. Thielen. 0 Excused: none. |
2014-04-15 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-16-14. |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Senate agrees with House amendments. Placed on the calendar for Final Reading on 04-16-14. |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Reconsideration of action taken on 04-10-14 in disagreeing to the House amendments. |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 685). |
2014-04-14 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Brower, Tokioka Co-Chairs; Awana, Fale Members. |
2014-04-10 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 670). |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 571). |
2014-04-08 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Belatti excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2014-04-04 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-08-14. |
2014-04-04 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1572-14) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2014-03-28 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Johanson, Cullen, Hashem, Ing, Jordan, Kobayashi, Morikawa, Onishi, Takayama, Tokioka, Woodson, Yamashita, Fukumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Lowen, Ward. |
2014-03-27 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2014-03-25 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 03-28-14 2:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2014-03-19 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Takai, Thielen excused (2). |
2014-03-19 | House | Reported from TOU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1032-14), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2014-03-17 | House | The committees on TOU recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Brower, Cachola, Choy, Ohno, Onishi, Tokioka, Tsuji, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Awana, Takai. |
2014-03-12 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by TOU on Monday, 03-17-14 10:00AM in House conference room 312. |
2014-03-06 | House | Referred to TOU, FIN, referral sheet 28 |
2014-03-06 | House | Pass First Reading |
2014-03-04 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 188) in amended form (SD 1). |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) L. Thielen . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2014-02-28 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-04-14. |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2571) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2014-02-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Espero, Kahele, Kouchi, Ruderman, Tokuda, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) L. Thielen ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Keith-Agaran. |
2014-02-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-19-14 9:20AM in conference room 211. |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Reported from TSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2193) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2014-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on TSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in TSM were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kahele, Ige, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Slom. |
2014-01-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on TSM deferred the measure until 02-05-14 2:45PM in conference room 229. |
2014-01-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on TSM has scheduled a public hearing on 01-29-14 3:00PM in conference room 229. |
2014-01-21 | Senate | Referred to TSM, WAM. |
2014-01-21 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2014-01-17 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2435 (Same As) 2014-03-19 - The committee on TSM deferred the measure.