HI SB2427 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-16 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Fukumoto, Har, Holt, Nakashima, Souki, Tokioka excused (7).
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-16 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Fukumoto, Har, Holt, Nakashima, Souki, Tokioka excused (7).
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a temporary Law Enforcement Working Group to recommend certification and de-certification requirements for state and county law enforcement officers who carry firearms and badges and have arrest authority. Prohibits law enforcement officers who are terminated for misconduct by a state or county department, agency, or office in a law enforcement capacity from being hired by another state or county law enforcement department, agency, or office unless the officer is reinstated through collective bargaining or the legal process. (SB2427 HD1)
Title
Relating To Law Enforcement.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-16 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Fukumoto, Har, Holt, Nakashima, Souki, Tokioka excused (7). |
2018-03-16 | House | Reported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1168-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2018-03-13 | House | The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Holt, Evans, Ichiyama, Yamashita, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Keohokalole. |
2018-03-08 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Tuesday, 03-13-18 10:30AM in House conference room 309. |
2018-03-08 | House | Referred to LAB, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 35 |
2018-03-08 | House | Pass First Reading |
2018-03-06 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 180) in amended form (SD 2). |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2018-03-02 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-06-18. |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2750) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2018-03-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, K. Rhoads, Gabbard, Kim, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2018-02-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 03-01-18 10:00AM in conference room 016. |
2018-02-09 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC. |
2018-02-09 | Senate | Reported from PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2181) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC. |
2018-02-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Wakai, Baker, Ihara, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2018-02-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM deferred the measure until 02-06-18 1:20PM in conference room 229. |
2018-01-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-01-18 1:35PM in conference room 229. |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Referred to PSM, JDC. |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2018-01-19 | Senate | Introduced. |