HI SB2416 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-03 - (S) The committee on EDU deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-03 - (S) The committee on EDU deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Transfers the administration of Pahala Public Library from the Public Library System to the Department of Education. Effective July 1, 2012.
Title
Pahala Public Library
Sponsors
Sen. Donovan Cruz [D] | Sen. Kalani English [D] | Sen. Josh Green [D] | Sen. Gilbert Kahele [D] |
Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. Ronald Kouchi [D] | Sen. Pohai Ryan [D] | Sen. Malama Solomon [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-03 | (S) The committee on EDU deferred the measure. | |
2012-01-31 | (S) The committee(s) on EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 02-03-12 1:15PM in conference room 225. | |
2012-01-23 | (S) Referred to EDU, WAM. | |
2012-01-23 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2012-01-20 | (S) Introduced. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=2416 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2012/Bills/SB2416_.HTM |