HI SB2407 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-27 - Referred to CPH.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-27 - Referred to CPH.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Redefines "peer review" to include reviews done by out-of-state public accountancy licensees. Increases deadlines for filing of peer review compliance reporting forms and appealing certain ratings from 10 days to 30 calendar days.
Title
Public Accountancy; Peer Review
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-27 | Senate | Referred to CPH. |
2016-01-25 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2016-01-22 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1669 (Same As) 2016-06-30 - Act 145, 06/29/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1247).
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=2407&year=2016 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2016/bills/SB2407_.HTM |