HI SB2406 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-15 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-15 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Defines the term "public interest" with regard to the issuance of special purpose revenue bonds. Takes effect 7/30/2075. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Special Purpose Revenue Bonds.
Sponsors
Sen. Laura Acasio [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. Kurt Fevella [R] |
Sen. Donna Kim [D] | Sen. Sharon Moriwaki [D] | Sen. Joy San Buenaventura [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-08 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-15 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2317) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2022-02-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Keohokalole, Acasio, Gabbard, Kim, Lee, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2022-02-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC deferred the measure until 02-08-22 9:26AM; Via Videoconference. |
2022-01-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 02-03-22 9:30AM; Via Videoconference. |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Referred to JDC, WAM. |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Introduced. |