HI SB2402 | 2012 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-10 - (S) Act 287, 7/9/2012 (Gov. Msg. No. 1404).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires new and replacement state outdoor light fixtures in counties with a population of at least 100,000 to be fully shielded and to have a correlated color temperature of 4,000 Kelvin or less beginning July 1, 2014, with certain exemptions. (CD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Outdoor Lighting; Starlight Reserve

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2012-07-10 (S) Act 287, 7/9/2012 (Gov. Msg. No. 1404).
2012-07-10 (H) Act 287, on 7/9/2012 (Gov. Msg. No. 1404).
2012-05-08 (S) Enrolled to Governor.
2012-05-02 (S) Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 720).
2012-05-01 (H) Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 831).
2012-05-01 (S) Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 24 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom. 0 Excused: none.
2012-05-01 (H) Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with Representative(s) Ching, Har, Johanson, Morikawa voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
2012-04-26 (S) 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-01-12.
2012-04-26 (H) Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 05-01-12.
2012-04-26 (H) Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 14-12) as amended in (CD 1).
2012-04-26 (S) Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 14-12).
2012-04-25 (S) The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 2 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Gabbard; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Espero.
2012-04-25 (H) The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Souki, Coffman, Ichiyama, Kawakami, Fontaine; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McKelvey.
2012-04-24 (S) Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-25-12 4:00PM in conference room 225.
2012-04-23 (H) Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 797).
2012-04-23 (S) Senate Conferees appointed: Wakai, Chair; Gabbard, Espero, Co-Chair(s); .
2012-04-17 (S) Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 611).
2012-04-16 (H) House conferees appointed: Souki, Coffman, McKelvey, Ichiyama Co-Chairs; Kawakami, Fontaine.
2012-04-12 (H) Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 679).
2012-04-12 (S) Senate disagrees with House amendments.
2012-04-12 (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 445).
2012-04-10 (H) Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Ching, Har, Morikawa voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
2012-04-05 (H) Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1566-12), recommending passage on Third Reading.
2012-03-29 (H) The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 17 Ayes: Representative(s) Oshiro, M. Lee, Choy, Giugni, Hashem, Ichiyama, Jordan, Kawakami, C. Lee, Tokioka, Yamashita, Marumoto, Riviere, Ward; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Cullen, Har, Morikawa; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
2012-03-28 (H) Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org
2012-03-27 (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 03-29-12 3:00PM in House conference room 308.
2012-03-23 (H) Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Herkes excused (1).
2012-03-23 (H) Reported from EEP/ERB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1290-12) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to FIN.
2012-03-20 (H) The committees on ERB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Choy, Awana, Brower, Evans, Hashem, Nishimoto, Tokioka, Tsuji, Marumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Pine.
2012-03-20 (H) The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Coffman, Kawakami, Cabanilla, Chang, Nakashima, Riviere, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Carroll, Har, Herkes, Ito.
2012-03-16 (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP/ERB on Tuesday, 03-20-12 10:30AM in House conference room 325.
2012-03-14 (H) Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on EEP/ERB with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Herkes excused (1).
2012-03-14 (H) Reported from TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 980-12), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to EEP/ERB.
2012-03-12 (H) The committees on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Souki, Ichiyama, Aquino, Cullen, M. Lee, Luke, Takumi, Yamashita, Fontaine, Johanson; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Saiki.
2012-03-09 (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by TRN on Monday, 03-12-12 9:00AM in House conference room 309.
2012-03-08 (H) Referred to TRN, EEP/ERB, FIN, referral sheet 41
2012-03-08 (H) Pass First Reading
2012-03-06 (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 173) in amended form (SD 1).
2012-03-06 (S) Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Solomon . Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Slom). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
2012-03-02 (S) Deferred until 03-06-12.
2012-03-01 (S) One Day Notice 03-02-12.
2012-03-01 (S) Reported from PGM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2460) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading.
2012-02-21 (S) The committee(s) on PGM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in PGM were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Kidani, Baker, Ryan; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom.
2012-02-17 (S) The committee(s) on PGM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-21-12 2:45PM in conference room 224.
2012-02-15 (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to PGM.
2012-02-15 (S) Reported from EDT/ENE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2213) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to PGM.
2012-02-09 (S) The committee(s) on ENE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in ENE were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, English, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Green, Slom.
2012-02-09 (S) The committee(s) on EDT recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDT were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Fukunaga, Wakai, Baker, Solomon; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom.
2012-01-30 (S) The committee(s) on EDT/ENE has scheduled a public hearing on 02-09-12 3:00PM in conference room 225.
2012-01-23 (S) Referred to EDT/ENE, PGM.
2012-01-23 (S) Passed First Reading.
2012-01-20 (S) Introduced.

Hawaii State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=2402
Texthttp://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2012/Bills/SB2402_.HTM
Texthttp://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2012/Bills/SB2402_SD1_.HTM
Texthttp://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2012/CommReports/SB2402_SD1_SSCR2213_.HTM
Texthttp://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2012/CommReports/SB2402_SD1_SSCR2460_.HTM
Texthttp://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2012/CommReports/SB2402_SD1_HSCR980-12_.HTM
Texthttp://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2012/Bills/SB2402_HD1_.HTM
Texthttp://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2012/CommReports/SB2402_HD1_HSCR1290-12_.HTM
Texthttp://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2012/CommReports/SB2402_HD1_HSCR1566-12_.HTM
Texthttp://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2012/Bills/SB2402_CD1_.HTM
Texthttp://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2012/CommReports/SB2402_CD1_CCR14-12_.HTM

Bill Comments

feedback