HI SB2400 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-21 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Tokioka, Ward, Yamane excused (3).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-21 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Tokioka, Ward, Yamane excused (3).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the Agribusiness Development Corporation to design a program that identifies emerging crops and productive uses for lands managed by the Agribusiness Development Corporation and helps prepare a workforce to cultivate these lands. Requires the Agribusiness Development Corporation and the Department of Agriculture to develop a coordinated land management strategy to promote diversified agriculture, support emerging and specialty crops, and maximize agricultural development. Requires the Agribusiness Development Corporation and Department of Agriculture to coordinate and provide technical support to farmers to identify emerging and promising crops and support and cultivate successful agricultural businesses. Effective July 1, 2525. (SB2400 HD2)
Title
Agribusiness Development Corporation
Sponsors
Sen. Donovan Cruz [D] | Sen. Malama Solomon [D] | Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] | Sen. Kalani English [D] |
Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] | Sen. Brian Taniguchi [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-21 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Tokioka, Ward, Yamane excused (3). |
2014-03-21 | House | Reported from HED (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1118-14) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN. |
2014-03-18 | House | The committees on HED recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Choy, Ichiyama, Aquino, Awana, Hanohano, Ohno, Say, Takumi, Matsumoto, Fale; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Takai. |
2014-03-17 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2014-03-14 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HED on Tuesday, 03-18-14 2:34PM in House conference room 309. |
2014-03-14 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on HED with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Creagan, Say, Tokioka, Yamashita excused (4). |
2014-03-14 | House | Reported from AGR/EDB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 969-14) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to HED. |
2014-03-13 | House | The committees on EDB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Tsuji, Ward, Awana, Brower, Cachola, Ito, Choy, Ohno, Onishi, Tokioka, Wooley; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2014-03-13 | House | The committees on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Wooley, Onishi, Awana, Brower, Cachola, Choy, Ohno, Tokioka, Tsuji, Matsumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2014-03-11 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2014-03-10 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 03-13-14 10:00AM in conference room 312. |
2014-03-10 | House | The committee(s) on AGR/EDB recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-13-14 at 10:00am. |
2014-03-07 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by AGR/EDB on Monday, 03-10-14 10:30AM in House conference room 312. |
2014-03-06 | House | Referred to AGR/EDB, HED, FIN, referral sheet 28 |
2014-03-06 | House | Pass First Reading |
2014-03-04 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 179) in amended form (SD 2). |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 2 (Hee, Shimabukuro). Transmitted to House. |
2014-02-28 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-04-14. |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2616) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2014-02-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, English, Espero, Kahele, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Tokuda, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Kouchi. |
2014-02-18 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-20-14 9:05AM in conference room 211. |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Reported from AGL/HRE/EGH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2206) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2014-02-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on HRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HRE were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Kidani; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Ige, Tokuda, Slom. |
2014-01-30 | Senate | The committee(s) on EGH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EGH were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Slom, Baker, Chun Oakland, English, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Wakai. |
2014-01-30 | Senate | The committee(s) on AGL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AGL were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Kouchi, Dela Cruz, English, L. Thielen, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Wakai. |
2014-01-30 | Senate | The committee(s) on HRE deferred the measure until 02-04-14 2:45PM in conference room 414. |
2014-01-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on AGL/HRE/EGH has scheduled a public hearing on 01-30-14 2:50PM in conference room 229. |
2014-01-21 | Senate | Referred to AGL/HRE/EGH, WAM. |
2014-01-21 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2014-01-17 | Senate | Introduced. |