HI SB2390 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-23 - (S) Act 050, 4/23/2010 (Gov. Msg. No. 512).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-23 - (S) Act 050, 4/23/2010 (Gov. Msg. No. 512).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Broadens the practical experience requirements for a pharmacist license to include experience obtained in U.S. territories and the District of Columbia. Removes the requirement that supervision must take place in a pharmacy. Broadens the experience requirements to relate to the practice of pharmacy. (SB2390 HD2)
Title
Pharmacy; Licensure; University of Hawaii at Hilo; College of Pharmacy
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-23 | (S) Act 050, 4/23/2010 (Gov. Msg. No. 512). | |
2010-04-23 | (H) Act 050, on 4/23/2010 (Gov. Msg. No. 266). | |
2010-04-12 | (S) Enrolled to Governor. | |
2010-04-12 | (S) Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 557). | |
2010-04-12 | (H) Re-referred to HLT, HED, CPC, referral sheet 65 | |
2010-04-12 | (H) House conferees appointed: Yamane, Chang, Herkes Co-Chairs; Nakashima, Tsuji, Marumoto. | |
2010-04-09 | (H) Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 538). | |
2010-04-09 | (H) Received notice of agreement (Sen. Com. No. 538). | |
2010-04-09 | (S) Passed Final Reading. 22 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 3 Excused: English, Takamine, Tsutsui. | |
2010-04-08 | (S) One Day Notice 04-09-10. | |
2010-04-08 | (S) Senate agrees with House amendments. Placed on the calendar for Final Reading on 04-09-10. | |
2010-04-07 | (S) Deferred until 04-08-10. | |
2010-04-07 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 356). | |
2010-04-06 | (H) Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Hanohano excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2010-04-01 | (H) Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-06-10. | |
2010-04-01 | (H) Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1129-10) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. | |
2010-03-24 | (H) The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Herkes, Wakai, Cabanilla, Carroll, Karamatsu, Luke, McKelvey, Morita, Souki, Tsuji, Marumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Belatti, Ito, Mizuno, Thielen. | |
2010-03-19 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 03-24-10 2:00PM in House conference room 325. | |
2010-03-18 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting no (0) and Cabanilla, Finnegan, Manahan, M. Oshiro excused (4). | |
2010-03-18 | (H) Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 823-10) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. | |
2010-03-12 | (H) The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Nishimoto, Bertram, Brower, Mizuno, Shimabukuro; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Finnegan; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Carroll. | |
2010-03-09 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Friday, 03-12-10 9:30AM in House conference room 329. | |
2010-03-03 | (H) Referred to HLT, CPC, referral sheet 33 | |
2010-03-03 | (H) Pass First Reading | |
2010-03-02 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 147) in amended form (SD 2). | |
2010-03-02 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Bunda). Transmitted to House. | |
2010-02-26 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 03-02-10. | |
2010-02-26 | (S) Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2414) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). | |
2010-02-19 | (S) The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Espero, Green, Ihara, Sakamoto; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Ige, Hemmings. | |
2010-02-12 | (S) The committee(s) on CPN will hold a public decision making on 02-19-10 9:15AM in conference room 229. | |
2010-02-12 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPN. | |
2010-02-12 | (S) Reported from HTH/HRE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2208) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to CPN. | |
2010-02-03 | (S) The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HTH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Green, Baker, Espero, Nishihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Hemmings. | |
2010-02-03 | (S) The committee(s) on HRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HRE were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Baker, Takamine, Taniguchi; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Sakamoto, Kokubun, Slom. | |
2010-01-28 | (S) The committee(s) on HTH/HRE has scheduled a public hearing on 02-03-10 2:45pm in conference room 016. | |
2010-01-27 | (S) Re-Referred to HTH/HRE, CPN. | |
2010-01-25 | (S) Referred to HTH, CPN. | |
2010-01-22 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2010-01-22 | (S) Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2056 (Same As) 2010-04-16 - (H) Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Wednesday 04-21-10 1:30PM in conference room 229.