HI SB2389 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-13 - (S) The committee on CPN deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-13 - (S) The committee on CPN deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
By January 1, 2014, requires businesses to implement a comprehensive, written policy and procedure to prevent identity theft, and to designate an employee to be responsible for protecting personal information. Requires businesses to train all employees in the implementation of the policy and procedure.
Title
Identity Theft; Personal Information
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-13 | (S) The committee on CPN deferred the measure. | |
2012-02-13 | (S) The committee on EDT deferred the measure. | |
2012-02-08 | (S) The committee(s) on EDT/CPN deferred the measure until 02-13-12 1:15PM in conference room 016. | |
2012-01-31 | (S) The committee(s) on EDT/CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-08-12 1:15PM in conference room 016. | |
2012-01-23 | (S) Referred to EDT/CPN, JDL. | |
2012-01-23 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2012-01-20 | (S) Introduced. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=2389 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2012/Bills/SB2389_.HTM |