HI SB238 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-09 - Failed to pass Third Reading with 21 Ayes Rep.(s) Representative(s) Awana, Belatti, Cachola, Choy, Evans, Ichiyama, Jordan, Kobayashi, Luke, Mizuno, Nakashima, Nishimoto, Ohno, Onishi, Oshiro, Rhoads, Saiki, Souki, Takayama, Takumi, Yamashita; 30 Noes Rep.(s) Representative(s) Aquino, Brower, Cabanilla, Carroll, Cheape, Coffman, Cullen, Fale, Fukumoto, Hanohano, Har, Hashem, Ing, Ito, Johanson, Kawakami, C. Lee, Lowen, McDermott, McKelvey, Morikawa, Say, Takai, Thielen, Tokioka, Tsuji, Ward, Woodson, Wooley, Yamane ; and 0 Excused Rep.(s) none.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-09 - Failed to pass Third Reading with 21 Ayes Rep.(s) Representative(s) Awana, Belatti, Cachola, Choy, Evans, Ichiyama, Jordan, Kobayashi, Luke, Mizuno, Nakashima, Nishimoto, Ohno, Onishi, Oshiro, Rhoads, Saiki, Souki, Takayama, Takumi, Yamashita; 30 Noes Rep.(s) Representative(s) Aquino, Brower, Cabanilla, Carroll, Cheape, Coffman, Cullen, Fale, Fukumoto, Hanohano, Har, Hashem, Ing, Ito, Johanson, Kawakami, C. Lee, Lowen, McDermott, McKelvey, Morikawa, Say, Takai, Thielen, Tokioka, Tsuji, Ward, Woodson, Wooley, Yamane ; and 0 Excused Rep.(s) none.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the definition of "student instructional hours" for elementary and secondary schools. Clarifies that statutorily established student instructional hour requirements are minimum requirements. Effective July 1, 2030. (SB238 HD2)
Title
Education; Instructional Hours
Sponsors
Sen. Jill Tokuda [D] | Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] | Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. Russell Ruderman [D] |
Sen. David Ige [D] | Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] | Sen. Sam Slom [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-09 | House | Failed to pass Third Reading with 21 Ayes Rep.(s) Representative(s) Awana, Belatti, Cachola, Choy, Evans, Ichiyama, Jordan, Kobayashi, Luke, Mizuno, Nakashima, Nishimoto, Ohno, Onishi, Oshiro, Rhoads, Saiki, Souki, Takayama, Takumi, Yamashita; 30 Noes Rep.(s) Representative(s) Aquino, Brower, Cabanilla, Carroll, Cheape, Coffman, Cullen, Fale, Fukumoto, Hanohano, Har, Hashem, Ing, Ito, Johanson, Kawakami, C. Lee, Lowen, McDermott, McKelvey, Morikawa, Say, Takai, Thielen, Tokioka, Tsuji, Ward, Woodson, Wooley, Yamane ; and 0 Excused Rep.(s) none. |
2013-04-05 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-09-13. |
2013-04-05 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1581) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2013-04-02 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Hashem, Ing, Jordan, Kobayashi, Lowen, Onishi, Takayama, Tokioka, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Johanson, Cullen, Morikawa, Fukumoto; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Woodson, Ward. |
2013-03-28 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 04-02-13 2:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2013-03-19 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Aquino, Carroll, Choy, Cullen, Fale, Hanohano, Har, Ito, Kawakami, McDermott, McKelvey, Morikawa, Thielen, Tokioka, Tsuji, Ward, Woodson, Yamane voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2013-03-19 | House | Reported from EDN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1003) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2013-03-13 | House | The committees on EDN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ohno, Hanohano, Ichiyama, Nakashima, Takai, Cheape; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Choy, Fale; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Aquino. |
2013-03-11 | House | The committee(s) on EDN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-13-13 at 2:00pm. |
2013-03-07 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EDN on Monday, 03-11-13 2:00PM in House conference room 309. |
2013-03-07 | House | Referred to EDN, FIN, referral sheet 30 |
2013-03-07 | House | Pass First Reading |
2013-03-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 99). |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Baker, Green, Hee, Ige, Keith-Agaran, Nishihara, Ruderman, Shimabukuro, Solomon, Taniguchi, L. Thielen . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2013-03-01 | Senate | Deferred until 03-05-13. |
2013-02-28 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-01-13. |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading. |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Reported from EDU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 472) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2013-02-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in EDU were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Kidani, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Shimabukuro, Slom. |
2013-02-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 02-06-13 3:00PM in conference room 414. |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Referred to EDU. |
2013-01-18 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2013-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB60 (Same As) 2013-02-13 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Fale, Hanohano voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Coffman, Har, Say excused (3).