HI SB2366 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-10 - Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 26
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-10 - Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 26
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires law enforcement agencies and departments to compile information on untested sexual assault collection kits and transmit the information to the department of the attorney general. Requires the department of the attorney general to transmit that information to the president of the senate and the speaker of the house. (SD1)
Title
Sexual Assault Collection Kit; Reporting; Attorney General; Sexual Assault; Forensic Evidence
Sponsors
Sen. Laura Thielen [D] | Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. William Espero [D] | Sen. Les Ihara [D] |
Sen. Russell Ruderman [D] | Sen. Gil Riviere [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-10 | House | Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 26 |
2016-03-10 | House | Pass First Reading |
2016-03-08 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 146) in amended form (SD 1). |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Riviere). Transmitted to House. |
2016-03-03 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-08-16. |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Reported from JDL/WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2597) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2016-02-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Dela Cruz, Chun Oakland, English, Galuteria, Inouye, Riviere, Taniguchi, Wakai, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto. |
2016-02-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Shimabukuro, Gabbard, K.Kahele, Kim, L. Thielen, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2016-02-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL/WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-24-16 10:00AM in conference room 211. |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDL/WAM. |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Reported from PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2095) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to JDL/WAM. |
2016-02-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in PSM were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Espero, Inouye, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Baker. |
2016-02-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-04-16 1:15PM in conference room 229. |
2016-01-29 | Senate | Re-Referred to PSM, JDL/WAM. |
2016-01-25 | Senate | Referred to PSM, JDL. |
2016-01-25 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2016-01-22 | Senate | Introduced. |