HI SB2360 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-04 - (S) The committee on ENE deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-04 - (S) The committee on ENE deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the definition of "deposit beverage" to include wine and hard spirits.
Title
Deposit Beverage Container Program; Wine and Hard Spirits
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-04 | (S) The committee on ENE deferred the measure. | |
2010-02-02 | (S) The committee(s) on ENE deferred the measure until 02-04-10 2:45pm in conference room 225. | |
2010-01-29 | (S) The committee(s) on ENE has scheduled a public hearing on 02-02-10 3:30pm in conference room 225. | |
2010-01-22 | (S) Referred to ENE, WAM. | |
2010-01-22 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2010-01-22 | (S) Introduced. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://capitol.hawaii.gov/Archives/measure_indiv_Archives.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=2360&year=2010 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2010/Bills/SB2360_.HTM |