HI SB2356 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-05 - The committee on PSM deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Agriculture and Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-05 - The committee on PSM deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Agriculture and Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes within the Department of Defense the position and duties of State Wildfire Marshal, the position and duties of State Wildfire Chief, the State Wildfire Corps, and the State Wildfire Fuel Reduction Task Force. Makes an appropriation.
Title
Relating To Wildfires.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-05 | Senate | The committee on PSM deferred the measure. |
2024-02-05 | Senate | The committee on AEN deferred the measure. |
2024-02-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN/PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-05-24 3:00PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference. |
2024-02-02 | Senate | Re-Referred to AEN/PSM, WAM/JDC. |
2024-01-22 | Senate | Referred to PSM, WAM/JDC. |
2024-01-19 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2024-01-19 | Senate | Introduced. |
Subjects
Appropriation ($)
DOD
Expenditure Ceiling
Positions
State Wildfire Chief
State Wildfire Corps
State Wildfire Fuel Reduction Task Force
State Wildfire Marshal
DOD
Expenditure Ceiling
Positions
State Wildfire Chief
State Wildfire Corps
State Wildfire Fuel Reduction Task Force
State Wildfire Marshal
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=2356&year=2024 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2024/bills/SB2356_.HTM |