HI SB2355 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-06 - The committee on TCA deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Transportation and Culture and the Arts Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-06 - The committee on TCA deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Transportation and Culture and the Arts Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Allows a letter of attestation to the Director of Finance to act as an endorsed certificate for motor vehicle transfer.
Title
Relating To Vehicle Titles.
Sponsors
Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-06 | Senate | The committee on TCA deferred the measure. |
2024-02-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on TCA deferred the measure until 02-06-24 3:05PM; Conference Room 224. |
2024-01-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on TCA has scheduled a public hearing on 02-01-24 3:00PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference. |
2024-01-19 | Senate | Referred to TCA, JDC. |
2024-01-19 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2024-01-19 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2322 (Same As) 2024-01-26 - Referred to JHA, referral sheet 3
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=2355&year=2024 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2024/bills/SB2355_.HTM |